Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Harford County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 /CH0429 (SB0795/CH0428)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Movie Theater License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0285
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Business Establishments Near Schools
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051 /CH0449
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Community College License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1581 /CH0012
Title
Harford County Deputy Sheriffs Dailey and Logsdon Benefits Memorial Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0892 /CH0429 (SB0795/CH0428) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Movie Theater License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0969 /CH0285 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Business Establishments Near Schools By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1051 /CH0449 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Community College License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1581 /CH0012 Harford County Deputy Sheriffs Dailey and Logsdon Benefits Memorial Act By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM