Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Harford County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 /CH0175 (SB0923/CH0176)
Title
Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0460 /CH0469
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Elected Members - Start Date of Term
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769
Title
Harford County Parishioner Protection Pilot Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 /CH0177
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Annual Financial Audit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 /CH0696
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Facility for the Aged License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 /CH0179
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Filing Period for Renewal Applications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1394
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Class B and Class BNR Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0401 /CH0175 (SB0923/CH0176) Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0460 /CH0469 Harford County Board of Education - Elected Members - Start Date of Term By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0769 Harford County Parishioner Protection Pilot Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB0803 /CH0177 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Annual Financial Audit By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 /CH0696 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Facility for the Aged License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1149 /CH0179 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Filing Period for Renewal Applications By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1394 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1408 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Class B and Class BNR Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM