Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Harford County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 /CH0090
Title
Harford County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 /CH0196 (SB0137/CH0197)
Title
Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 /CH0260 (SB0138/CH0261)
Title
Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 (SB0380)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class DLR License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 /CH0350 (SB0375/CH0351)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865 (SB0383)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class BNR License – Newly Opened Restaurant
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 /CH0370 (SB0385/CH0371)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961
Title
Harford County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962 (SB0373)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Assisted Living Program License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0963 /CH0391 (SB0496/CH0392)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sale License Record Keeping and Enforcement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0971 /CH0394 (SB0376/CH0395)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class GCR (Golf Course Restaurant) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972 /CH0396 (SB0379/CH0397)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C-3 License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177 /CH0438 (SB0599/CH0439)
Title
Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187 (SB0381)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Bowling Alley License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0164 /CH0090 Harford County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 90
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 /CH0196 (SB0137/CH0197) Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 196
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0573 /CH0260 (SB0138/CH0261) Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 260
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0829 (SB0380) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class DLR License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0864 /CH0350 (SB0375/CH0351) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 350
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0865 (SB0383) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class BNR License – Newly Opened Restaurant By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0923 /CH0370 (SB0385/CH0371) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 370
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0961 Harford County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0962 (SB0373) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Assisted Living Program License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0963 /CH0391 (SB0496/CH0392) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sale License Record Keeping and Enforcement By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 391
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0971 /CH0394 (SB0376/CH0395) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class GCR (Golf Course Restaurant) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 394
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0972 /CH0396 (SB0379/CH0397) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C-3 License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 396
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1177 /CH0438 (SB0599/CH0439) Sheriff of Harford County - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 438
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1187 (SB0381) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Bowling Alley License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1272 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:18 PM