Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Harford County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0120 (HB0125)
Title
Harford County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Harford County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 /CH0158
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container Permits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 (HB0831)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Regional Fire and Rescue Boat
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0120 (HB0125) Harford County - School Buses - Length of Operation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0274 Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Harford County - Warrant Intercept Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0299 /CH0158 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container Permits By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0878 (HB0831) Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Regional Fire and Rescue Boat By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM