Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Harford County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 /CH0052
Title
Harford County - State's Attorney - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916 /CH0448
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Community College License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1088 (HB0806)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Harford County - License and Permit Fees and Repealing Obsolete Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1104 /CH0525 (HB1624/CH0526)
Title
Transportation - Highways - Heroes Highway
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0146 /CH0052 Harford County - State's Attorney - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0916 /CH0448 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Community College License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1088 (HB0806) Alcoholic Beverages - Harford County - License and Permit Fees and Repealing Obsolete Provisions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1104 /CH0525 (HB1624/CH0526) Transportation - Highways - Heroes Highway By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM