Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Harford County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 /CH0647 (HB0083)
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0440
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Establishing the Minimum Capital Investment for Class DBR Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 /CH0536
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class DBR Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0073 /CH0647 (HB0083) Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0440 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Establishing the Minimum Capital Investment for Class DBR Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0441 /CH0536 Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class DBR Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM