Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health And Government Operations Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186 /CH0317
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0788 /CH0119
Title
Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program - Program Oversight and Continuation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798 /CH0121
Title
Health Insurance - Reporting Requirements - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800
Title
Health Insurance - Payments to Noncontracting Specialists and Noncontracting Nonphysician Specialists
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 /CH0122
Title
Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0802
Title
Health Insurance - Provider Panel Lists
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220 /CH0136
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 /CH0360 (SB0200/CH0359)
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0186 /CH0317 Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - Establishment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0788 /CH0119 Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program - Program Oversight and Continuation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0798 /CH0121 Health Insurance - Reporting Requirements - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 Health Insurance - Payments to Noncontracting Specialists and Noncontracting Nonphysician Specialists By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0801 /CH0122 Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0802 Health Insurance - Provider Panel Lists By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 /CH0136 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0497 /CH0360 (SB0200/CH0359) Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM