Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health And Government Operations Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0123 /CH0720
Title
Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 /CH0103
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128 /CH0211
Title
State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 /CH0208
Title
Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program - Regulations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 /CH0108
Title
Procurement - Department of General Services - Exemption for Historic Structures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 /CH0109
Title
Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Nonlicensed Persons - Provisional Licensure
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0110
Title
Secretary of Aging - Administration of Commodity Supplemental Food Program and Regulatory Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147 /CH0206
Title
Healthy Aging Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148 /CH0111
Title
State Archives - Care of Fine Art or Decorative Art - Procurement Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0154 /CH0113
Title
Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747 /CH0139
Title
Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1432 /CH0570
Title
Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1549
Title
Public Health - Drug Overdose Prevention Programs - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0824 /CH0823 (SB0548/CH0824)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265 /CH0218 (SB0549/CH0217)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0123 /CH0720 Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 720
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0127 /CH0103 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0128 /CH0211 State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0132 /CH0208 Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program - Regulations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0144 /CH0108 Procurement - Department of General Services - Exemption for Historic Structures By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0145 /CH0109 Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Nonlicensed Persons - Provisional Licensure By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0146 /CH0110 Secretary of Aging - Administration of Commodity Supplemental Food Program and Regulatory Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0147 /CH0206 Healthy Aging Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0148 /CH0111 State Archives - Care of Fine Art or Decorative Art - Procurement Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0154 /CH0113 Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0747 /CH0139 Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1432 /CH0570 Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017) By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1549 Public Health - Drug Overdose Prevention Programs - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0824 /CH0823 (SB0548/CH0824) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1265 /CH0218 (SB0549/CH0217) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM