Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health And Government Operations Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167
Title
State Government - Notices and Communications - Use of Electronic Means
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168 /CH0103
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Inactive Status of Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248
Title
Health Occupations - Certified Associate Counselors-Alcohol and Drug and Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - Qualifications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384
Title
Substance Use Facilities and Programs - Certificate of Need - Repeal of Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1726
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1792
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Deputy Secretary for Operations and Director of the Behavioral Health Administration - Repeal of Positions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0756 (SB0552/CH0757)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0167 State Government - Notices and Communications - Use of Electronic Means By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0168 /CH0103 State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Inactive Status of Licenses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0248 Health Occupations - Certified Associate Counselors-Alcohol and Drug and Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - Qualifications By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0384 Substance Use Facilities and Programs - Certificate of Need - Repeal of Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1726 Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1792 Maryland Department of Health - Deputy Secretary for Operations and Director of the Behavioral Health Administration - Repeal of Positions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0742 /CH0756 (SB0552/CH0757) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 756
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM