Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health And Government Operations Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049
Title
Recoupment of the Health Insurance Provider Fee - Calculation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420 /CH0390
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Services for Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Fee-for-Service Payment Pilot Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1421 /CH0391
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 Recoupment of the Health Insurance Provider Fee - Calculation By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0716 State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act) By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1420 /CH0390 Maryland Department of Health - Services for Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Fee-for-Service Payment Pilot Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1421 /CH0391 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Functions and Outreach By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM