Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Howard County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0450 /CH0116
Title
Howard County - Property Tax Credit - Renovated, Upgraded, or Rehabilitated Property Ho. Co. 11-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454
Title
Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 8-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 /CH0117
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers Ho. Co. 15-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0559)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Historic Belmont Property Restoration Ho. Co. 5-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457 (SB0562)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Middle Patuxent Environmental Area Ho. Co. 1-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0460 (SB0560)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - The Arc's Homewood Road Renovation Ho. Co. 2-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461 (SB0558)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence Center Ho. Co. 6-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 (SB0561)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Blandair Regional Park Ho. Co. 4-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 /CH0648
Title
Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0901 /CH0142
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Establishments - Distance from Schools
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 /CH0149
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 10-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404 (SB0992)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 18-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1405
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farm Brewery License Ho. Co. 17-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406 /CH0416 (SB0003)
Title
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Increases Ho. Co. 13-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407 /CH0153
Title
Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Ho. Co. 12-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409
Title
Howard County - Winery Special Events Permits - Farmers' Markets Ho. Co. 16-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1419
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Linwood Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1514 /CH0421
Title
Howard County - Noise Control - Outdoor Concert Venues Ho. Co. 9-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0450 /CH0116 Howard County - Property Tax Credit - Renovated, Upgraded, or Rehabilitated Property Ho. Co. 11-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0454 Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 8-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0455 /CH0117 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers Ho. Co. 15-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0456 (SB0559) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Historic Belmont Property Restoration Ho. Co. 5-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0457 (SB0562) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Middle Patuxent Environmental Area Ho. Co. 1-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0460 (SB0560) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - The Arc's Homewood Road Renovation Ho. Co. 2-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0461 (SB0558) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence Center Ho. Co. 6-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0462 (SB0561) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Blandair Regional Park Ho. Co. 4-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0895 /CH0648 Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0901 /CH0142 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Establishments - Distance from Schools By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1240 /CH0149 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 10-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1404 (SB0992) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 18-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB1405 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farm Brewery License Ho. Co. 17-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1406 /CH0416 (SB0003) Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Increases Ho. Co. 13-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1407 /CH0153 Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Ho. Co. 12-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 Howard County - Winery Special Events Permits - Farmers' Markets Ho. Co. 16-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1419 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Linwood Center By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1514 /CH0421 Howard County - Noise Control - Outdoor Concert Venues Ho. Co. 9-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM