Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Howard County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 (SB0426)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Head Start Program Retrofitting Ho. Co. 5-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 (SB0425)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Historic Belmont Property and Historic Garden Restoration Ho. Co. 6-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0643)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Community Action Council Food Bank Facility Ho. Co. 10-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466 (SB0427)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Day Resource Center Ho. Co. 4-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470 (SB0424)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Shaded Structures for Playgrounds Ho. Co. 7-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Howard County - Supported Living Facility Ho. Co. 11-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084
Title
Howard County - Practice of Massage - Regulation Ho. Co. 13-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Population Restriction on Class A Licenses Ho. Co. 1-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 /CH0443
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Festivals Ho. Co. 09-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1092
Title
Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 03-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093 /CH0444
Title
Howard County Board of Education - Members - Salary Increase Ho. Co. 2-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1411
Title
Howard County - Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board - Compensation Ho. Co. 12-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0449 (SB0426) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Head Start Program Retrofitting Ho. Co. 5-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0455 (SB0425) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Historic Belmont Property and Historic Garden Restoration Ho. Co. 6-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0456 (SB0643) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Community Action Council Food Bank Facility Ho. Co. 10-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0466 (SB0427) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Day Resource Center Ho. Co. 4-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0470 (SB0424) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Shaded Structures for Playgrounds Ho. Co. 7-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0471 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Howard County - Supported Living Facility Ho. Co. 11-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1084 Howard County - Practice of Massage - Regulation Ho. Co. 13-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Population Restriction on Class A Licenses Ho. Co. 1-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1091 /CH0443 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Festivals Ho. Co. 09-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1092 Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 03-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1093 /CH0444 Howard County Board of Education - Members - Salary Increase Ho. Co. 2-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1411 Howard County - Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board - Compensation Ho. Co. 12-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM