Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Howard County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 /CH0072
Title
Howard County - Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board - Compensation Ho. Co. 6-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 (SB0236)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Environmental Education Center Renovation and Expansion Ho. Co. 2-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205 (SB0233)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Community Action Council Food Bank Facility Ho. Co. 4-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0206 (SB0234)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Howard County Historical Society Roof Repair Ho. Co. 9-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209
Title
Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0424 /CH0090
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event - Education Permits Ho. Co. 05-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 /CH0246
Title
Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 7-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426 (SB0235)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Historic Clover Hill Farm House Restoration Ho. Co. 10-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440 /CH0248
Title
Howard County - Insurance - Certificates of Guarantee for County Bond Requirements Ho. Co. 8-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0145 /CH0072 Howard County - Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board - Compensation Ho. Co. 6-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0204 (SB0236) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Environmental Education Center Renovation and Expansion Ho. Co. 2-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 AM
HB0205 (SB0233) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Community Action Council Food Bank Facility Ho. Co. 4-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 AM
HB0206 (SB0234) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Howard County Historical Society Roof Repair Ho. Co. 9-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 AM
HB0209 Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2016
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0424 /CH0090 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event - Education Permits Ho. Co. 05-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0425 /CH0246 Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 7-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0426 (SB0235) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Historic Clover Hill Farm House Restoration Ho. Co. 10-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 AM
HB0440 /CH0248 Howard County - Insurance - Certificates of Guarantee for County Bond Requirements Ho. Co. 8-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM