Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Howard County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621 (SB0040)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Environmental Education Center Renovation and Expansion Ho. Co. 2-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 /CH0493
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Howard County Deputy Sheriffs Ho. Co. 11-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632 /CH0622
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Luxury Restaurants and Farm Breweries - Licenses Ho. Co. 14-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0650 (SB0609)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 1-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651 (SB0610)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - South Branch Park Ho. Co. 3-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 (SB0611)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Huntington Park Ho. Co. 4-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 (SB0613)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Community Action Council Food Bank Facility Ho. Co. 6-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654 /CH0625
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 10-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655 /CH0272
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Licenses Ho. Co. 7-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0612)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Solomon's Lodge #121 Ho. Co. 5-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671 /CH0626
Title
Howard County - Practice of Massage - Regulation Ho. Co. 13-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090 /CH0130 (SB0670)
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 15-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1105 /CH0132
Title
Howard County Public School System - Access to Public Information Ho. Co. 9-16
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0621 (SB0040) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Environmental Education Center Renovation and Expansion Ho. Co. 2-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0631 /CH0493 Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Howard County Deputy Sheriffs Ho. Co. 11-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0632 /CH0622 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Luxury Restaurants and Farm Breweries - Licenses Ho. Co. 14-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0650 (SB0609) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 1-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0651 (SB0610) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - South Branch Park Ho. Co. 3-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0652 (SB0611) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Huntington Park Ho. Co. 4-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0653 (SB0613) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Community Action Council Food Bank Facility Ho. Co. 6-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0654 /CH0625 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 10-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0655 /CH0272 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Licenses Ho. Co. 7-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0656 (SB0612) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Solomon's Lodge #121 Ho. Co. 5-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0671 /CH0626 Howard County - Practice of Massage - Regulation Ho. Co. 13-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 /CH0130 (SB0670) Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 15-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1105 /CH0132 Howard County Public School System - Access to Public Information Ho. Co. 9-16 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM