Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071
Title
Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement Plans
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0176
Title
Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 /CH0018
Title
Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening Standards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074
Title
Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075 /CH0019
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of Citations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0022
Title
Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of Assistance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0179
Title
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178
Title
Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support Obligation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 (HB0282)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 /CH0035 (HB0129)
Title
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 (HB0130)
Title
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 /CH0036 (HB0277)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Review Hearings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0037 (HB0278)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0071 Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement Plans By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 /CH0176 Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and Penalties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 /CH0018 Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening Standards By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0075 /CH0019 Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of Citations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0022 Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of Assistance By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0179 Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0181 Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support Obligation By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0229 (HB0282) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 /CH0035 (HB0129) Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0263 (HB0130) Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0264 /CH0036 (HB0277) Children in Need of Assistance - Review Hearings By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 /CH0037 (HB0278) Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM