Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0003
Title
Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance Technician
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026 /CH0005
Title
Motor Vehicles - Commercial Instructional Permit Holders - Administrative Penalties and Procedures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 /CH0006
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0013
Title
Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load Limits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0014
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial and Farm Vehicles - Safety Inspections and Utility Emergencies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0127
Title
Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load Limits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0017
Title
Drunk Driving - Ignition Interlock System Program - Repeat Offenders
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094
Title
Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 (HB0159)
Title
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - Penalty
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 (HB0174/CH0217)
Title
Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and Duties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115 (HB0163)
Title
Correctional Services - Minimum Security Inmates - Transfer to Local Correctional Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0135
Title
Juvenile Law - Committed Facilities - Extension of Termination Date
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117
Title
Juvenile Law - Commitment - Placement Visits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122 /CH0035
Title
Juvenile Law - Detention - Community Detention Violation Hearings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 (HB0108)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 (HB0038)
Title
Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0468 (HB0001)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 (HB0079/CH0213)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 /CH0124 (HB0045)
Title
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0006 /CH0003 Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance Technician By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0026 /CH0005 Motor Vehicles - Commercial Instructional Permit Holders - Administrative Penalties and Procedures By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0033 /CH0006 Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 /CH0013 Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load Limits By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0014 Vehicle Laws - Commercial and Farm Vehicles - Safety Inspections and Utility Emergencies By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0127 Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load Limits By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0017 Drunk Driving - Ignition Interlock System Program - Repeat Offenders By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 (HB0159) Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - Penalty By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0114 (HB0174/CH0217) Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and Duties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0115 (HB0163) Correctional Services - Minimum Security Inmates - Transfer to Local Correctional Facilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0116 /CH0135 Juvenile Law - Committed Facilities - Extension of Termination Date By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0117 Juvenile Law - Commitment - Placement Visits By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 /CH0035 Juvenile Law - Detention - Community Detention Violation Hearings By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0032 (HB0108) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 (HB0038) Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 /CH0468 (HB0001) Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0068 (HB0079/CH0213) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0069 /CH0124 (HB0045) Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM