Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 /CH0146 (HB0048)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Collection of Appearance Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0004 (HB0050)
Title
Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB0049/CH0057)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 (HB0053)
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 (HB0054/CH0488)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065 (HB0052)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 (HB0051/CH0487)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 (HB0131/CH0069)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0060 /CH0146 (HB0048) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Collection of Appearance Fees By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 /CH0004 (HB0050) Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0062 (HB0049/CH0057) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0063 (HB0053) Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 (HB0054/CH0488) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0065 (HB0052) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0066 (HB0051/CH0487) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 (HB0131/CH0069) Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM