Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0157
Title
Human Resources - Transition Planning for Foster Youth
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 /CH0044
Title
State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted Prizes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079 /CH0045
Title
State Citizens Review Board for Children - Penalties for Unauthorized Disclosure of Child Protection Case Information
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0158
Title
Commercial Drivers' Licenses - Cancellations and Downgrades (Driving Privilege Preservation Act of 2016)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081
Title
Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082
Title
Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0529
Title
Public Safety - School Safety Enforcement Fund
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 /CH0381 (HB0192/CH0382)
Title
Juvenile Causes - Permanency Plans - Age Restrictions on Use of Another Planned Permanent Living Arrangement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0077 /CH0157 Human Resources - Transition Planning for Foster Youth By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0078 /CH0044 State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted Prizes By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0079 /CH0045 State Citizens Review Board for Children - Penalties for Unauthorized Disclosure of Child Protection Case Information By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0080 /CH0158 Commercial Drivers' Licenses - Cancellations and Downgrades (Driving Privilege Preservation Act of 2016) By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0081 Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination Date By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0082 Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0083 /CH0529 Public Safety - School Safety Enforcement Fund By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0360 /CH0381 (HB0192/CH0382) Juvenile Causes - Permanency Plans - Age Restrictions on Use of Another Planned Permanent Living Arrangement By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM