Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005
Title
Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected Vehicles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011
Title
Correctional Services - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Composition of Hearing Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 /CH0007
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Claimant Award Basis
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024 /CH0008
Title
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification Policies - Repeal of Submission Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0030
Title
Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035 /CH0194
Title
Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 /CH0009
Title
Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043 /CH0193
Title
Juvenile Court Records - Disclosure
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 /CH0195
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0746 /CH0834 (HB0476)
Title
District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 /CH0156 (HB1219/CH0157)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0005 Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0009 Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected Vehicles By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0011 Correctional Services - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Composition of Hearing Board By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0022 /CH0007 Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Claimant Award Basis By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0024 /CH0008 Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification Policies - Repeal of Submission Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0027 Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0030 Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0035 /CH0194 Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0037 /CH0009 Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0043 /CH0193 Juvenile Court Records - Disclosure By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 /CH0195 Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0746 /CH0834 (HB0476) District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 /CH0156 (HB1219/CH0157) Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM