Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009 /CH0044
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Return of an Original Document - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039 /CH0041
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Disability Parking Placards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 /CH0100
Title
Nonstock Corporations – Consolidations, Mergers, and Conversions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0412
Title
Child Support - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program - Documentation and Reporting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079 /CH0413
Title
Child Support - Employment Program Participation - Reinstatement of Driver's License and Expungement of Suspension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082 /CH0101
Title
Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Quantity and Resignation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0668
Title
Charitable Organizations - Registration Late Fees - Distribution and Use
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 /CH0669
Title
Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107
Title
Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005 (HJ0003/JR0003)
Title
Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0009 /CH0044 Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Return of an Original Document - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0039 /CH0041 Motor Vehicle Administration - Disability Parking Placards By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 /CH0100 Nonstock Corporations – Consolidations, Mergers, and Conversions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 /CH0412 Child Support - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program - Documentation and Reporting By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0079 /CH0413 Child Support - Employment Program Participation - Reinstatement of Driver's License and Expungement of Suspension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0082 /CH0101 Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Quantity and Resignation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0668 Charitable Organizations - Registration Late Fees - Distribution and Use By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 /CH0669 Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-0)
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SJ0005 (HJ0003/JR0003) Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM