Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Proceedings Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001 /CH0076
Title
Paternity Proceedings - Attorney for the Child Support Administration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Child Support - Lien Against Monetary Award
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024 /CH0078 (HB1212/CH0077)
Title
Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0025 /CH0127
Title
Real Property - Conservation Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recording Notice
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026 /CH0266
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Expedited Document Processing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 /CH0138
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Expiration and Renewal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0145
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Claims - Electronic Filing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0139
Title
Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071
Title
Juvenile Law - Intake Procedures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0270
Title
Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084 /CH0140
Title
Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Application - Signature Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0001 /CH0076 Paternity Proceedings - Attorney for the Child Support Administration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0023 Child Support - Lien Against Monetary Award By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0024 /CH0078 (HB1212/CH0077) Family Law - Kinship Caregivers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0025 /CH0127 Real Property - Conservation Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recording Notice By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0026 /CH0266 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Expedited Document Processing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0060 /CH0138 Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Expiration and Renewal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 /CH0145 Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Claims - Electronic Filing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0070 /CH0139 Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 Juvenile Law - Intake Procedures By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 /CH0270 Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0084 /CH0140 Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Application - Signature Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM