Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judiciary Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 /CH0089
Title
Correctional Services - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Subpoena Power
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 /CH0090
Title
Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246
Title
Juvenile Law - Placement Visits - Video Conferencing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247 /CH0091
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Administration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264 /CH0611
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Records - Disclosure
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292 /CH0431
Title
Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of Sunset
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430 /CH0371
Title
Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor Vehicles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129 (SB0262/CH0035)
Title
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 (SB0263)
Title
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277 (SB0264/CH0036)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Review Hearings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278 (SB0265/CH0037)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0282 (SB0229)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0244 /CH0089 Correctional Services - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Subpoena Power By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0245 /CH0090 Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0246 Juvenile Law - Placement Visits - Video Conferencing By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0247 /CH0091 Criminal Procedure - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Administration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0264 /CH0611 Juvenile Law - Juvenile Records - Disclosure By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0292 /CH0431 Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of Sunset By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0430 /CH0371 Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor Vehicles By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0129 (SB0262/CH0035) Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0130 (SB0263) Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0277 (SB0264/CH0036) Children in Need of Assistance - Review Hearings By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0278 (SB0265/CH0037) Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0282 (SB0229) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM