Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judiciary Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159 (SB0113)
Title
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - Penalty
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163 (SB0115)
Title
Correctional Services - Minimum Security Inmates - Transfer to Local Correctional Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 (SB0126/CH0139)
Title
Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174 /CH0217 (SB0114)
Title
Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and Duties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0086
Title
Family Law - Adoption, Search, Contact, and Reunion Services - Relatives of Minors in Out-of-Home Placement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179 /CH0087
Title
Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 (SB0064/CH0468)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0038 (SB0061)
Title
Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0069/CH0124)
Title
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079 /CH0213 (SB0068)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0032)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500
Title
Judgeships - District Court
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release of Criminal Defendants - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public Defender
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0159 (SB0113) Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - Penalty By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0163 (SB0115) Correctional Services - Minimum Security Inmates - Transfer to Local Correctional Facilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0173 (SB0126/CH0139) Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0174 /CH0217 (SB0114) Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and Duties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0178 /CH0086 Family Law - Adoption, Search, Contact, and Reunion Services - Relatives of Minors in Out-of-Home Placement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0179 /CH0087 Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0001 (SB0064/CH0468) Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0038 (SB0061) Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0045 (SB0069/CH0124) Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0079 /CH0213 (SB0068) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0108 (SB0032) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0500 Judgeships - District Court By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0537 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release of Criminal Defendants - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public Defender By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM