Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judiciary Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110 /CH0298
Title
Law Enforcement - Special Police Officers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188 /CH0302
Title
Maryland Capitol Police of the Department of General Services
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1237 /CH0305
Title
Police and Correctional Training Commissions - Applicants - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 /CH0306
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Justice Information Advisory Board - Members
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0048 (SB0060/CH0146)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Collection of Appearance Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049 /CH0057 (SB0062)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 (SB0061/CH0004)
Title
Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051 /CH0487 (SB0066)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052 (SB0065)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 (SB0063)
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 /CH0488 (SB0064)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 /CH0069 (SB0087)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1110 /CH0298 Law Enforcement - Special Police Officers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1188 /CH0302 Maryland Capitol Police of the Department of General Services By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1237 /CH0305 Police and Correctional Training Commissions - Applicants - Criminal History Records Checks By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1279 /CH0306 Criminal Procedure - Criminal Justice Information Advisory Board - Members By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0048 (SB0060/CH0146) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Collection of Appearance Fees By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0049 /CH0057 (SB0062) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0050 (SB0061/CH0004) Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0051 /CH0487 (SB0066) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0052 (SB0065) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0053 (SB0063) Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0054 /CH0488 (SB0064) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Judiciary
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0131 /CH0069 (SB0087) Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM