Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judiciary Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 /CH0717
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476 (SB0746/CH0834)
Title
District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219 /CH0157 (SB0912/CH0156)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1017 /CH0717 Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1428 Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 9:30 a.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2017 - 9:30 AM
HB0476 (SB0746/CH0834) District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1219 /CH0157 (SB0912/CH0156) Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM