Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judiciary Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190 /CH0671
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247 /CH0422 (SB0963)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386
Title
Child Support - Potential Income - Definition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0190 /CH0671 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and Evaluation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0247 /CH0422 (SB0963) Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0385 Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0386 Child Support - Potential Income - Definition By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM