Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judiciary Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167
Title
Juvenile Causes - Safe Haven Newborns
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168 /CH0032
Title
Public Safety - Reporting of Hate Crimes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169 /CH0271
Title
State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Duties and Access to Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Family Law - Paternity and Birth Certificates
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842
Title
Criminal Procedure - Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision - Violations and Petitions for Discharge
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843 /CH0079
Title
Department of Human Services - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Information
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0167 Juvenile Causes - Safe Haven Newborns By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0168 /CH0032 Public Safety - Reporting of Hate Crimes By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Judiciary
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0169 /CH0271 State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Duties and Access to Records By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0373 Family Law - Paternity and Birth Certificates By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0842 Criminal Procedure - Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision - Violations and Petitions for Discharge By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0843 /CH0079 Department of Human Services - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Information By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM