Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Montgomery County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 (SB0302/CH0289)
Title
Montgomery County - City of Takoma Park - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B On- and Off-Sale License MC 18-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 /CH0485 (SB0305/CH0484)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Sales and Delivery to Retail Dealers MC 19-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0385 (SB0313)
Title
Montgomery County - Town of Kensington - Alcoholic Beverages - Special B-K Licenses MC 15-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 /CH0386 (SB0298)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Montgomery County - Beer Festivals MC 11-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0387 (SB0301)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License MC 9-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0138 (SB0309/CH0290)
Title
Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone MC 5-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 (SB0308)
Title
Montgomery County - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Automated External Defibrillator MC 17-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140 (SB0310/CH0055)
Title
Montgomery County - Micro-Brewery Licenses and Class D Beer and Light Wine Licenses MC 3-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141 (SB0306/CH0054)
Title
Montgomery County - Barbershops - Restriction on Operation Repealed MC 1-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142 (SB0300/CH0483)
Title
Montgomery County - Proportion of Food and Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Class B Licenses and Class B-BWL (H-M) Licenses MC 14-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 (SB0312)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers MC 6-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 /CH0586 (SB0307)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 12-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0388 (SB0311)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special BWL Community Performing Arts Facility License MC 7-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147 (SB0299/CH0482)
Title
Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts MC 13-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 (SB0459/CH0504)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License MC 20-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 (SB0657/CH0324)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 16-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638 (SB0815/CH0197)
Title
Criminal Law - Telecommunication Devices in Place of Confinement - Montgomery County Work Release and Prerelease Programs MC 21-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0960 (SB1025)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement MC 22-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0131 (SB0302/CH0289) Montgomery County - City of Takoma Park - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B On- and Off-Sale License MC 18-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0132 /CH0485 (SB0305/CH0484) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Sales and Delivery to Retail Dealers MC 19-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0135 /CH0385 (SB0313) Montgomery County - Town of Kensington - Alcoholic Beverages - Special B-K Licenses MC 15-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0136 /CH0386 (SB0298) Alcoholic Beverages - Montgomery County - Beer Festivals MC 11-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0137 /CH0387 (SB0301) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License MC 9-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0138 (SB0309/CH0290) Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone MC 5-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0139 (SB0308) Montgomery County - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Automated External Defibrillator MC 17-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Health and Government Operations
HB0140 (SB0310/CH0055) Montgomery County - Micro-Brewery Licenses and Class D Beer and Light Wine Licenses MC 3-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0141 (SB0306/CH0054) Montgomery County - Barbershops - Restriction on Operation Repealed MC 1-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0142 (SB0300/CH0483) Montgomery County - Proportion of Food and Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Class B Licenses and Class B-BWL (H-M) Licenses MC 14-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0143 (SB0312) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers MC 6-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0144 /CH0586 (SB0307) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 12-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0146 /CH0388 (SB0311) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special BWL Community Performing Arts Facility License MC 7-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0147 (SB0299/CH0482) Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts MC 13-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0269 (SB0459/CH0504) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License MC 20-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0463 (SB0657/CH0324) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 16-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0638 (SB0815/CH0197) Criminal Law - Telecommunication Devices in Place of Confinement - Montgomery County Work Release and Prerelease Programs MC 21-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0960 (SB1025) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement MC 22-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM