Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Montgomery County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 /CH0060
Title
Montgomery County - Free-Play Pinball Machines - Placement Restrictions - Repeal MC 2-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education - Primary Election Ballots MC 6-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0086
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting MC 7-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Montgomery County - Warrant Intercept Program MC 8-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088 /CH0061
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers MC 19-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089 /CH0062
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BD-BWL License MC 18-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 (SB0426/CH0171)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Requirements MC 17-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091 /CH0063
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Laytonsville MC 12-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092 /CH0064
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Auction Permits MC 9-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 /CH0065
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - 1-Day License for Schools, Places of Worship, and Youth Centers MC 10-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095 /CH0066
Title
City of Gaithersburg - Licensed Alcoholic Beverages Restaurants - Distance from Churches or Other Places of Worship MC 23-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 /CH0067
Title
Montgomery County - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Adoption of Local Ordinance MC 11-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107
Title
Medical Professional Liability Insurance for Nonprofit Health Care Providers MC 4-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy MC 22-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202 /CH0077
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries MC 21-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 /CH0085
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses in Takoma Park MC 29-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459
Title
Montgomery County - Rectifiers and Bottlers - Liquor Sales and Delivery to Retail Dealers MC 25-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 /CH0427
Title
Montgomery County - Education - School Bus - Doors That Lock MC 27-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0712
Title
Montgomery County - Micro-Breweries - Beer and Liquor MC 26-15
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0082 /CH0060 Montgomery County - Free-Play Pinball Machines - Placement Restrictions - Repeal MC 2-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0085 Montgomery County - Board of Education - Primary Election Ballots MC 6-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0086 Montgomery County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting MC 7-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/05/2015 - 2:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0087 Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Montgomery County - Warrant Intercept Program MC 8-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0088 /CH0061 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers MC 19-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0089 /CH0062 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BD-BWL License MC 18-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0090 (SB0426/CH0171) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Requirements MC 17-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0091 /CH0063 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Laytonsville MC 12-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0092 /CH0064 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Auction Permits MC 9-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0093 /CH0065 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - 1-Day License for Schools, Places of Worship, and Youth Centers MC 10-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0095 /CH0066 City of Gaithersburg - Licensed Alcoholic Beverages Restaurants - Distance from Churches or Other Places of Worship MC 23-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0106 /CH0067 Montgomery County - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Adoption of Local Ordinance MC 11-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0107 Medical Professional Liability Insurance for Nonprofit Health Care Providers MC 4-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0176 Montgomery County Board of Education - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy MC 22-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0202 /CH0077 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries MC 21-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0316 /CH0085 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses in Takoma Park MC 29-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0459 Montgomery County - Rectifiers and Bottlers - Liquor Sales and Delivery to Retail Dealers MC 25-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0510 /CH0427 Montgomery County - Education - School Bus - Doors That Lock MC 27-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0712 Montgomery County - Micro-Breweries - Beer and Liquor MC 26-15 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM