Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Montgomery County Delegation & Prince George's Co Deleg

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Supplementary Salary MC/PG 106-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0634
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Restrictions on Commissioners from Montgomery County MC/PG 102-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0636 /CH0124
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary District - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 103-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 /CH0626
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - High Performance Buildings MC/PG 101-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638 /CH0125
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Minority Business Enterprise Programs and Task Force Extension MC/PG 107-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 /CH0627
Title
Maryland-Washington Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel MC/PG 111-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0640 /CH0126
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Sewage Leaks - Notice Requirements MC/PG 115-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 /CH0127
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing MC/PG 113-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 /CH0628
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Sewage Leaks - Posting Requirements MC/PG 114-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0650 /CH0630
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Prevailing Wage MC/PG 112-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit District - Establishment of Sales Outlets in Prince George's County MC/PG 117-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1455 /CH0687
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0633 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Supplementary Salary MC/PG 106-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
HB0634 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0635 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Restrictions on Commissioners from Montgomery County MC/PG 102-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0636 /CH0124 Washington Suburban Sanitary District - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 103-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0637 /CH0626 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - High Performance Buildings MC/PG 101-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Environmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0638 /CH0125 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Minority Business Enterprise Programs and Task Force Extension MC/PG 107-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0639 /CH0627 Maryland-Washington Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel MC/PG 111-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0640 /CH0126 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Sewage Leaks - Notice Requirements MC/PG 115-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0641 /CH0127 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing MC/PG 113-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0642 /CH0628 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Sewage Leaks - Posting Requirements MC/PG 114-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0650 /CH0630 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Prevailing Wage MC/PG 112-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1239 Washington Metropolitan Area Transit District - Establishment of Sales Outlets in Prince George's County MC/PG 117-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1455 /CH0687 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM