Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

St. Mary's County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 /CH0094
Title
St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0288 /CH0096
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 /CH0364
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 6 Pub-Brewery License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423
Title
St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0555 /CH0378
Title
St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees - Deferrals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1507 /CH0690
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0257 /CH0094 St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Requirements By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0285 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery License By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0288 /CH0096 St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Appropriations
2/05/2013 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0301 /CH0364 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 6 Pub-Brewery License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0423 St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0520 St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0555 /CH0378 St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees - Deferrals By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1507 /CH0690 St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 690
Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM