Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

St. Mary's County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 /CH0283 (SB1001)
Title
St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889 /CH0284 (SB0997)
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission Bonds - Extension of Maximum Maturity Date
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0890 /CH0129 (SB0996)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Landlord and Tenant Law - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917 /CH0599 (SB0998/CH0598)
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Tax Credit - New or Expanding Businesses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972 (SB0995/CH0236)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062 /CH0601 (SB1015/CH0600)
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Permits, Training, Prohibited Acts, and Violations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1092 /CH0297 (SB0999)
Title
St. Mary's County - Keeper of the Jail - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185 (SB1000)
Title
St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0884 /CH0283 (SB1001) St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local Provisions By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0889 /CH0284 (SB0997) St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission Bonds - Extension of Maximum Maturity Date By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB0890 /CH0129 (SB0996) St. Mary's County - Local Landlord and Tenant Law - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0917 /CH0599 (SB0998/CH0598) St. Mary's County - Property Tax Credit - New or Expanding Businesses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0972 (SB0995/CH0236) St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1062 /CH0601 (SB1015/CH0600) St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Permits, Training, Prohibited Acts, and Violations By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1092 /CH0297 (SB0999) St. Mary's County - Keeper of the Jail - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1185 (SB1000) St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM