Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

St. Mary's County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 /CH0293 (SB0104/CH0292)
Title
St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0299 (SB0102/CH0298)
Title
St. Mary's County - Farm Fences - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0105)
Title
St. Mary's County - Fire Tax and Rescue Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163 /CH0287 (SB0162/CH0286)
Title
St. Mary's County - Mobile Home Parks - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0290 (SB0103/CH0291)
Title
St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 /CH0048 (SB0101/CH0047)
Title
St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207 /CH0050 (SB0140/CH0049)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 /CH0052 (SB0163/CH0051)
Title
St. Mary's County - Electricians and Board of Electrical Examiners - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209 /CH0295 (SB0124/CH0294)
Title
St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 /CH0423 (SB0394)
Title
St. Mary's County - Auditing Requirements - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 /CH0425 (SB0234)
Title
St. Mary's County - Land Records - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0119 (SB0297/CH0120)
Title
St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 /CH0288
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Art Establishment License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 /CH0289
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0296 (SB0395/CH0297)
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682 (SB0298/CH0428)
Title
St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700 (SB0738)
Title
St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 /CH0427 (SB0736)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914 (SB0735/CH0426)
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Authority to Borrow Money
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055 (SB0737/CH0424)
Title
St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and Repayment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 /CH0293 (SB0104/CH0292) St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0109 /CH0299 (SB0102/CH0298) St. Mary's County - Farm Fences - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0111 (SB0105) St. Mary's County - Fire Tax and Rescue Tax - Distribution of Revenue By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0163 /CH0287 (SB0162/CH0286) St. Mary's County - Mobile Home Parks - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0187 /CH0290 (SB0103/CH0291) St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0194 /CH0048 (SB0101/CH0047) St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0207 /CH0050 (SB0140/CH0049) St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0208 /CH0052 (SB0163/CH0051) St. Mary's County - Electricians and Board of Electrical Examiners - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0209 /CH0295 (SB0124/CH0294) St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0243 /CH0423 (SB0394) St. Mary's County - Auditing Requirements - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0404 /CH0425 (SB0234) St. Mary's County - Land Records - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0431 /CH0119 (SB0297/CH0120) St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0526 /CH0288 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Art Establishment License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0538 /CH0289 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 /CH0296 (SB0395/CH0297) St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0682 (SB0298/CH0428) St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0700 (SB0738) St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0892 /CH0427 (SB0736) St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0914 (SB0735/CH0426) St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Authority to Borrow Money By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1055 (SB0737/CH0424) St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and Repayment By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM