Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

St. Mary's County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105 /CH0106
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Beer License Fee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 /CH0107
Title
St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Disposition of Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 /CH0741
Title
St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136
Title
St. Mary's County - Board of Library Trustees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0108
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331 /CH0109
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 /CH0106 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Beer License Fee By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0107 /CH0107 St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Disposition of Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Fees By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0110 /CH0741 St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 741
Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0136 St. Mary's County - Board of Library Trustees By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0275 /CH0108 St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0331 /CH0109 St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM