Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

St. Mary's County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - On-Site Consumption Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089
Title
St. Mary's County - Emergency Snow Routes - Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090
Title
St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 (SB0261)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121
Title
St. Mary’s County – Metropolitan Commission – Collection of Fees, Assessments, and Nonsubstantive and Clarifying Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155
Title
St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Tax Revenue - Authorized Use
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176
Title
St. Mary's County Open Meetings Act - Closed Sessions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414
Title
St. Mary’s County – Property Tax Credit for Improvements to Commercial Real Property and Transfer Tax Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440
Title
St. Mary's County Open Meetings Act - Public Agencies and Use of New Technology
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - On-Site Consumption Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0089 St. Mary's County - Emergency Snow Routes - Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0090 St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0097 (SB0261) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0121 St. Mary’s County – Metropolitan Commission – Collection of Fees, Assessments, and Nonsubstantive and Clarifying Revisions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0155 St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Tax Revenue - Authorized Use By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0176 St. Mary's County Open Meetings Act - Closed Sessions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0414 St. Mary’s County – Property Tax Credit for Improvements to Commercial Real Property and Transfer Tax Sunset Extension By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0440 St. Mary's County Open Meetings Act - Public Agencies and Use of New Technology By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 3:26 PM