Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

St. Mary's County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 (SB0239)
Title
St. Mary’s County – Public and Nonpublic Schools – Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527
Title
St. Mary’s County Human Relations Commission – Equal Treatment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528
Title
St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distillery On-Site Consumption Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530
Title
St. Mary's County - Gaming - Administration of Bingo Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 (SB0861)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862
Title
St. Mary’s County and Metropolitan Commission – Debt Limitations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863
Title
St. Mary’s County – Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Officials - Salaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0526 (SB0239) St. Mary’s County – Public and Nonpublic Schools – Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0527 St. Mary’s County Human Relations Commission – Equal Treatment By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0528 St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0529 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distillery On-Site Consumption Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0530 St. Mary's County - Gaming - Administration of Bingo Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0813 (SB0861) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0862 St. Mary’s County and Metropolitan Commission – Debt Limitations By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0863 St. Mary’s County – Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1097 St. Mary's County - Local Officials - Salaries By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 12:30 PM
Click to return on the top page