Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ways And Means Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475
Title
Public School Labor Relations - Renegotiation Procedures and Board Administration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0624
Title
Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust Fund - Income Tax Checkoff
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0751
Title
Income Tax Credit - Maryland Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 /CH0137
Title
Video Lottery Gaming - Term of License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 /CH0390
Title
Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0475 Public School Labor Relations - Renegotiation Procedures and Board Administration By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0613 /CH0624 Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0750 Maryland Veterans Trust Fund - Income Tax Checkoff By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0751 Income Tax Credit - Maryland Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0752 /CH0137 Video Lottery Gaming - Term of License By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Ways and Means
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0803 /CH0390 Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM