Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ways And Means Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 /CH0384
Title
Central Collection Unit - Debt Certification - Withholding of Income Tax Refunds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 /CH0230
Title
Gaming - Emergency Suspension of License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0099
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0460 /CH0231
Title
Gaming - Background Investigations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461 /CH0232
Title
State Early Childhood Advisory Council
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 /CH0601
Title
Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Extension and Alteration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520 (SB1051)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0988 /CH0434 (SB0527)
Title
Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0127 /CH0384 Central Collection Unit - Debt Certification - Withholding of Income Tax Refunds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB0454 /CH0230 Gaming - Emergency Suspension of License By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB0459 /CH0099 Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0460 /CH0231 Gaming - Background Investigations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB0461 /CH0232 State Early Childhood Advisory Council By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0465 State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0510 /CH0601 Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Extension and Alteration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0520 (SB1051) Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0988 /CH0434 (SB0527) Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM