Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ways And Means Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089
Title
Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 (SB0496/CH0445)
Title
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091 (SB0495/CH0339)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092 (SB0498/CH0453)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 (SB0497/CH0446)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Term
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094 /CH0258
Title
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 /CH0107
Title
Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and Procedures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 /CH0786
Title
Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713 /CH0718
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Light Rail Vehicles - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0715 /CH0328
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Teacher Preparation Programs - Accreditation and Approval
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872
Title
Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development Projects
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0089 Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
HB0090 (SB0496/CH0445) Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0091 (SB0495/CH0339) Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0092 (SB0498/CH0453) Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0093 (SB0497/CH0446) Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Term By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0094 /CH0258 Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching Funds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Ways and Means
2/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0095 Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0143 /CH0107 Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and Procedures By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0529 /CH0786 Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 786
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0713 /CH0718 Sales and Use Tax - Light Rail Vehicles - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0715 /CH0328 Institutions of Higher Education - Teacher Preparation Programs - Accreditation and Approval By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0872 Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development Projects By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM