Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ways And Means Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171
Title
Elections - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination and Filing of Final Campaign Finance Report
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 /CH0153
Title
Election Law – Voter Registration Deadlines
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 /CH0084
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174 /CH0154
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests - Last Four Digits of Social Security Number
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175 /CH0085
Title
Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176 /CH0155
Title
Election Law – Candidates – Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0177 /CH0156
Title
Election Law - Judicial Proceedings Involving Local Boards of Elections - Notice
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465 /CH0268
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution of Recordation and Transfer Tax Revenues
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0171 Elections - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination and Filing of Final Campaign Finance Report By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0172 /CH0153 Election Law – Voter Registration Deadlines By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0173 /CH0084 Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Ways and Means
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2019 - 2:30 PM
HB0174 /CH0154 Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests - Last Four Digits of Social Security Number By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0175 /CH0085 Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Ways and Means
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0176 /CH0155 Election Law – Candidates – Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0177 /CH0156 Election Law - Judicial Proceedings Involving Local Boards of Elections - Notice By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0465 /CH0268 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution of Recordation and Transfer Tax Revenues By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM