Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Ways And Means Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 /CH0117
Title
Election Law - Certificates of Candidacy and Ballot Questions - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853 /CH0116
Title
Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342 /CH0115
Title
Economic Development - Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0738 /CH0117 Election Law - Certificates of Candidacy and Ballot Questions - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0853 /CH0116 Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 /CH0115 Economic Development - Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:04 PM
Click to return on the top page