Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Washington County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253 (SB0535/CH0495)
Title
Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip Jars
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546 (SB0508/CH0060)
Title
Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 /CH0489 (SB0506/CH0488)
Title
Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0552
Title
Public Secondary Schools - Fall Sports Season - Start Date
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 /CH0048 (SB0408/CH0047)
Title
Washington County - Special Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0558 (SB0814/CH0557)
Title
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0792 /CH0059 (SB0507/CH0058)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
Washington County - Polling Places - Electioneering Boundaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511 (SB1042)
Title
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0253 (SB0535/CH0495) Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip Jars By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0546 (SB0508/CH0060) Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0551 /CH0489 (SB0506/CH0488) Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0552 Public Secondary Schools - Fall Sports Season - Start Date By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0559 /CH0048 (SB0408/CH0047) Washington County - Special Deputy Sheriffs By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0720 /CH0558 (SB0814/CH0557) Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense Provisions By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0792 /CH0059 (SB0507/CH0058) Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1060 Washington County - Polling Places - Electioneering Boundaries By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1511 (SB1042) Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM