Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Washington County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217 /CH0590 (SB0469)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Washington County - Warrants
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322 (SB0692/CH0327)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurant Seating Capacity and License Quota
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Washington County Gaming Commission - Membership - Conflict of Interest
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1399 /CH0250 (SB1046)
Title
Washington County - Sheriff and County Commissioners - Salaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0217 /CH0590 (SB0469) Maryland Income Tax Refund - Washington County - Warrants By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Ways and Means
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0322 (SB0692/CH0327) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurant Seating Capacity and License Quota By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1385 Washington County Gaming Commission - Membership - Conflict of Interest By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1399 /CH0250 (SB1046) Washington County - Sheriff and County Commissioners - Salaries By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM