Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Washington County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227 /CH0362 (HB0790/CH0363)
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 /CH0070 (HB0868/CH0071)
Title
Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517 /CH0217 (HB0867)
Title
Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - Process
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB0831/CH0279)
Title
Washington County - Collection of Fees, Charges, Penalties, and Assessments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 (HB0845)
Title
Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 /CH0397 (HB0756)
Title
County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and Refund
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523 (HB0779/CH0118)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Local Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 /CH0586 (HB1320/CH0587)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater) License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0989 (HB1557)
Title
Washington County Board of Education - Access to Public School Courses - Nonpublic School Students
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1076 /CH0465 (HB1551)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Population Ratio Quota - Classes of Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1077 /CH0238 (HB1548)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal Procedures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1078 /CH0239 (HB1549)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor - License Fee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1079 /CH0605 (HB1550)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1135 /CH0471
Title
Washington County - Business Licenses - Repeal of Zoning Certification Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0227 /CH0362 (HB0790/CH0363) Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0516 /CH0070 (HB0868/CH0071) Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0517 /CH0217 (HB0867) Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - Process By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0518 (HB0831/CH0279) Washington County - Collection of Fees, Charges, Penalties, and Assessments By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0519 (HB0845) Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0520 /CH0397 (HB0756) County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and Refund By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0523 (HB0779/CH0118) Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Local Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0877 /CH0586 (HB1320/CH0587) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater) License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0989 (HB1557) Washington County Board of Education - Access to Public School Courses - Nonpublic School Students By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1076 /CH0465 (HB1551) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Population Ratio Quota - Classes of Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1077 /CH0238 (HB1548) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal Procedures By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1078 /CH0239 (HB1549) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor - License Fee By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1079 /CH0605 (HB1550) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1135 /CH0471 Washington County - Business Licenses - Repeal of Zoning Certification Requirement By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM