Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Washington County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0322 /CH0098 (HB1320/CH0097)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 /CH0317 (HB1202)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340 /CH0321 (HB1156/CH0320)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 (HB1218)
Title
Possession of Medical Cannabis in Local Correctional Facilities – Prohibition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847 (HB0903/CH0780)
Title
Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0886 (HB1477)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Work and Community Engagement Requirements - Waiver
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0887 /CH0319 (HB1147/CH0318)
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Minimum Percentage of Disability
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888
Title
Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of Negotiations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 (HB1321/CH0099)
Title
Washington County – Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1147 (HB1702)
Title
Juveniles – Reportable Offenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1148 /CH0615 (HB1704)
Title
Washington County - Advisory School Design Review Committee - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1162 /CH0421 (HB1712)
Title
Washington County - Superintendent of Schools - Appointment and Reappointment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0322 /CH0098 (HB1320/CH0097) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0323 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0324 /CH0317 (HB1202) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0340 /CH0321 (HB1156/CH0320) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0714 (HB1218) Possession of Medical Cannabis in Local Correctional Facilities – Prohibition By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0847 (HB0903/CH0780) Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0886 (HB1477) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Work and Community Engagement Requirements - Waiver By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0887 /CH0319 (HB1147/CH0318) Washington County - Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Minimum Percentage of Disability By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0888 Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of Negotiations By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0889 (HB1321/CH0099) Washington County – Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB1147 (HB1702) Juveniles – Reportable Offenses By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1148 /CH0615 (HB1704) Washington County - Advisory School Design Review Committee - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1162 /CH0421 (HB1712) Washington County - Superintendent of Schools - Appointment and Reappointment By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM