Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Washington County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104 (HB0354)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 /CH0265 (HB1110)
Title
Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0122 (HB0424/CH0121)
Title
Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501 (HB0702)
Title
Washington County - Abandoned Vehicles - Regulation by Local Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 /CH0124 (HB0700/CH0123)
Title
Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0104 (HB0354) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0140 /CH0265 (HB1110) Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0141 /CH0122 (HB0424/CH0121) Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0501 (HB0702) Washington County - Abandoned Vehicles - Regulation by Local Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0590 /CH0124 (HB0700/CH0123) Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM