Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Gaming -see also- Awards; Bingo; Casinos; Lottery; Raffles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136
Title
Election Law - Campaign Contributions - Alterations and Prohibition on Sports and Event Wagering Business Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0371
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388 (SB0045)
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0403
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0452)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024
Title
Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 (HB0388)
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243
Title
Public High Schools - Health Education - Gambling Dangers and Addiction
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 (HB0532)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0136 Election Law - Campaign Contributions - Alterations and Prohibition on Sports and Event Wagering Business Entities Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0371 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0388 (SB0045) State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0403 Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0532 (SB0452) Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0546 Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0024 Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc. Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 (HB0388) State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0243 Public High Schools - Health Education - Gambling Dangers and Addiction Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2021 - 3:00 PM
SB0452 (HB0532) Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 4:48 PM