Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/4/2020 9:22:59 PM
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
Senate
Created: 1/8/2020 12:06 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by Moody's on the Economy

Created: 1/8/2020 12:06 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Alliance for the Poor

Created: 12/12/2019 11:08 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Full Committee Briefing
Overview of the final policy and funding recommendations of the Kirwan Commission.

Created: 12/19/2019 4:07 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr FIN (Dept)

Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
Chr FIN (Dept)

Public Adjusters - Disbursement of Insurance Settlement Payments
Chr FIN (Dept)

Health Care Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exception for State-Owned Facilities
Chr FIN (Dept)

Health Insurance - Health Information - Disclosures Between Carriers

Created: 1/3/2020 11:45 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sens Carozza and Lee

Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
Sen Lee

Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Ransomware
Sen Hough

Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Definition
Sen Hough

Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Life Imprisonment

House
Created: 1/8/2020 11:12 AM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
MCEC and MEII Reports

Created: 1/13/2020 11:30 AM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Briefing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 142, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on FFPSA Implementation

Created: 1/8/2020 3:02 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
10:45 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
or immediately following floor session
Dept of Labor: Implementation Updates
Uninsured Employers' Fund: Solvency

Created: 1/9/2020 10:29 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Update from the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange (MHBE) and the Comptroller of Maryland on the Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program (MEEHP)

Created: 12/17/2019 9:33 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the State Department of Assessments and Taxation

Other
Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board
Created: 12/17/2019 4:27 PM
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board meeting.