Day(s)
As of: 3/19/2024 6:57:32 AM
Created: 1/19/2021 4:50 PM
Thursday, January 21, 2021
4:00 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Chr EHE (Dept)
State Board of Public Accountancy – Education Requirements – Obsolete References
(Added - 1/19/2021 5:01 PM)
Sen Eckardt
Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
(Added - 1/20/2021 11:51 AM)
Created: 12/22/2020 4:44 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the State Board of Elections
Created: 1/20/2021 12:41 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Some or all of these bills to be voted on.
Del Feldmark
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Del Wilson
Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
Del Ebersole
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
(Removed - 1/21/2021 1:45 PM)
Created: 1/15/2021 12:25 PM
12:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 1/18/2021 12:31 PM
1:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Wilson
Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
Del Ebersole
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
(Removed - 1/21/2021 1:44 PM)
Update from County Executive Steuart Pittman on Covid-19 and the County.
Education briefing with Baltimore City Schools CEO, Dr. Sonja Santelises
(Added - 1/19/2021 6:19 PM)
Local Bill Hearings
Briefing: Baltimore County Multi-Year Improvement Plan for All Schools (MYIPAS)
(Joint Baltimore County House and Senate Delegations)
Bill Hearing (House Delegation only): HB4, HB253,HB348
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.
Economic security update for Frederick County.
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.
Baltimore City Senate Delegation with Baltimore City Stakeholders
Delegation Meeting
Organizational Meeting