Day(s)
As of: 3/29/2024 6:51:18 AM
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/23/2020 1:07 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sens West and McCray
Education - High School Students - Graduation and Attendance Credit for Vocational Training
Sen Bailey, et al
Public Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Operation Requirements
The Pres (Admin), et al
Education - Community and Local Accountability for Struggling Schools (CLASS) Act of 2020 - Innovation Schools
Sen Ellis, et al
Higher Education - Annual Revenues of For-Profit Institutions - Limitation on Enrollment (Veterans' Education Protection Act)
Sen Pinsky, et al
Higher Education - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship - Revisions
Sen Elfreth, et al
Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
Sens Waldstreicher and Rosapepe
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Outbreak Response Plan
(Added - 1/27/2020 7:43 PM)
Created: 1/13/2020 2:16 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/15/2020 3:20 PM)
(Added - 1/15/2020 3:20 PM)
Sen Guzzone
Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers
(Added - 1/15/2020 3:20 PM)
(Added - 1/20/2020 10:57 AM)
(Added - 1/22/2020 11:49 AM)
(Removed - 1/23/2020 5:44 PM)
(Removed - 1/24/2020 9:49 AM)
Sen Lee, et al
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
(Removed - 1/24/2020 9:49 AM)
Created: 1/17/2020 11:42 AM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc), et al
Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
Sen Hough, et al
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
(Added - 1/21/2020 4:37 PM)
(Added - 1/21/2020 4:37 PM)
(Added - 1/21/2020 4:37 PM)
Sen Lam, et al
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Waiver of Immunity From Suit in Federal Court and Venue
(Added - 1/21/2020 4:37 PM)
Chr JPR (Md Jud Conf)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Surcharge on Recordable Instruments
(Added - 1/21/2020 4:37 PM)
(Added - 1/23/2020 8:45 AM)
(Added - 1/23/2020 8:45 AM)
Sen Benson
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
(Added - 1/28/2020 2:39 PM)
(Added - 1/30/2020 12:20 PM)
Created: 1/16/2020 12:22 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Del M. Jackson (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
(Added - 1/24/2020 2:19 PM)
Chr Jt Audit Com
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Costs and Frequency of Audits
(Added - 1/24/2020 2:19 PM)
Del Lierman, et al
Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
(Added - 1/24/2020 2:19 PM)
Dels Barron and Korman
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Sovereign Immunity - Employee Whistleblower Protection
(Added - 1/24/2020 2:19 PM)
(Added - 1/24/2020 2:19 PM)
(Added - 1/24/2020 2:19 PM)
(Added - 1/29/2020 9:24 AM)
Del P. Young, et al
Higher Education - Annual Revenues of For-Profit Institutions - Limitation on Enrollment (Veterans' Education Protection Act)
(Added - 1/29/2020 9:24 AM)
Del P. Young, et al
Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
(Added - 1/29/2020 9:24 AM)
Del M. Jackson (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)
State Retirement Agency – Monitoring and Recording of Automated Outgoing Telephone Calls – Authorization
(Added - 1/31/2020 11:37 AM)
Del Hill, et al
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
(Removed - 1/28/2020 9:45 AM)
(Removed - 1/30/2020 11:41 AM)
(Removed - 1/31/2020 4:22 PM)
Created: 1/24/2020 10:36 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Dels Parrott and Hartman
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Exemptions for Auctioneers
Created: 1/17/2020 12:13 PM
2:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Chr ENT (Dept)
Real Property - Ground Leases - Required Notifications - Private Transaction Redemptions
Chr ENT (Dept)
State Ethics Commission – Determination of Public Official in an Executive Unit – Information From Units of State Government
Chr ENT (Dept)
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Eligible Organizations - Alteration of Geographic Boundaries
Del Krimm
Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
Created: 1/21/2020 5:23 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Dels Krebs and Pena-Melnyk
Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships
Del Szeliga, et al
Health Occupations - Diagnostic Evaluation and Treatment of Patients - Disciplinary Actions (The Patient's Access to Integrative Healthcare Act of 2020)
The Spkr (Admin), et al
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
(Removed - 1/22/2020 10:56 AM)
Del Hill, et al
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2020)
(Removed - 1/22/2020 5:20 PM)
Del Hill, et al
Public Health - Schedule II Controlled Dangerous Substances - Partial Filling of Prescriptions
(Removed - 1/22/2020 5:20 PM)
Created: 1/29/2020 4:48 PM
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Del Rogers, et al
Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
Dels Krebs and M. Jackson (By Request)
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Created: 1/21/2020 11:36 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Chr JUD (Dept)
Criminal Procedure - Examination of Defendant by Maryland Department of Health - Access to Judicial Records
Del Shetty, et al
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Del Barron, et al
Criminal Procedure - Petition to Modify or Reduce Sentence (Maryland Second Look Act)
The Spkr (Admin), et al
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Annual Report - Crimes of Violence (The Judicial Transparency Act of 2020)
The Spkr (Admin), et al
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
(Added - 1/22/2020 10:47 AM)
Del Shetty, et al
Consumer Protection - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
(Removed - 1/22/2020 10:46 AM)
Created: 1/21/2020 1:15 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/22/2020 3:31 PM)